Short trick | Multiplication with 11

Short trick of multiplication of any number with 11:

To learn the short trick of multiplication with 11 is so easy. For multiplication with 11 of a 2-digit number firstly you will have to add the two digits and place the sum in between them. Lets understand.

Example:: 35 x 11=?

Step 1: write it as 3_ 5
Step 2: now put the sum of 3 and 5 i.e. 8 & Put 8 between 3 & 5.
385 is Answer.

Example:: 65 x 11=?

Step 1: Write it as 6_5
Step 2: Now 6+5=11, between 6 & 5. But you can’t put 11 directly between 6 & 5. So always remember note always last digit of 11 and remaining digit will be added a carry in its left side i.e. 6. Let’s understand:

65 x 11= 6/11/5
=6+1/1/5 [ taken 1 of 11 as a carry in 6 and added to it]
=715

Similarly,

45 x 11 = 495
21 x 11 = 231
28 x 11 = 306 {8+2=10, note 0 & taken 1 as the carry & added it with 2.}

I hope, this article will help you a lot to understand the Short trick | Multiplication with 11. If you still have any doubts and problems with any topic of mathematics you can ask your problem in the Ask Question section. You will get a reply shortly.

Related Links:

Short Trick | Finding a square of any two digit number
Short trick | Finding Square of the number having last digit 5
Short trick of square of 3-digit number
Short trick | Finding Square root of a non-perfect Square number

2 thoughts on “Short trick | Multiplication with 11

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *